ME LD408 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Prohibit Taxpayer-funded Campaign Expenditures from Being Used on Post-election Parties
Title
An Act To Prohibit Taxpayer-funded Campaign Expenditures from Being Used on Post-election Parties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-11 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #60 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-25 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-04-20 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-20 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-04-18 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-18 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-20). |
2017-04-18 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-04-18 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-20) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-04-18 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2017-04-18 | House | On motion of Representative LUCHINI of Ellsworth, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-04-18 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-04-13 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME And PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-20) |
2017-04-13 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-20) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-04-11 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 60 Yeas 35 - Nays 0 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Reports READ |
2017-02-07 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-02-07 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-02-07 | Senate | REFERENCE to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed |