ME LD378 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-25 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-25 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, to Eliminate the So-called Fail First Requirement for Children's Residential Services for Certain Individuals Whose Needs Are Unable to Be Met with Home and Community-based Services by Expanding Eligibility for Those Individuals
Title
Resolve, to Eliminate the So-called Fail First Requirement for Children's Residential Services for Certain Individuals Whose Needs Are Unable to Be Met with Home and Community-based Services by Expanding Eligibility for Those Individuals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-25 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2023-04-19 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2023-04-13 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2023-04-13 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-03-17 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2023-01-31 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence |
2023-01-31 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-01-31 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2023-01-31 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |