ME LD369 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-10 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-10 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Criminalize Recording an Incident in Progress but Failing To Report the Incident Immediately to the Appropriate Authority
Title
An Act To Criminalize Recording an Incident in Progress but Failing To Report the Incident Immediately to the Appropriate Authority
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-03-05 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2021-03-01 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2021-03-01 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on February 8, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=369&snum=130 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0152&item=1&snum=130 |