ME LD359 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-06 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-06 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Address Student Hunger with a "Breakfast after the Bell" Program
Title
An Act To Address Student Hunger with a "Breakfast after the Bell" Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2020-02-04 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-02-04 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2020-02-04 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2020-01-30 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-01-30 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-78) as Amended by Senate Amendment "B" (S-373) thereto. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2020-01-28 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-78) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "B" (S-373) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-78) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "B" (S-373) thereto ADOPTED |
2020-01-28 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "B" (S-373) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-78) READ and ADOPTED |
2020-01-28 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-100) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-78) was INDEFINITELY POSTPONED |
2020-01-28 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Under further suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Senate Amendment "A" (S-100) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-78) was ADOPTED |
2020-01-28 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Under further suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (S-78) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-100) thereto was ADOPTED |
2020-01-28 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-78) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-100) thereto |
2020-01-28 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2019-06-20 | House | Carried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | CARRIED OVER on the Special Appropriations Table to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-23 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-05-21 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-21 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-78) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-100) thereto. |
2019-05-21 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-05-21 | House | Senate Amendment "A" (S-100) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-78) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-05-21 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-78) was READ. |
2019-05-21 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-05-21 | House | On motion of Representative KORNFIELD of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-05-21 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-78) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-100) thereto |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-78) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-100) thereto ADOPTED |
2019-05-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator MOORE of Washington Senate Amendment "A" (S-100) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-78) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-78) READ |
2019-05-16 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-05-07 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending her motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report, |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senator MILLETT of Cumberland moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Reports READ |
2019-01-24 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-24 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |