ME LD358 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on August 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on August 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Close the Gap in Children's Health Care Coverage in Maine
Title
An Act To Close the Gap in Children's Health Care Coverage in Maine
Sponsors
Sen. Matthew Pouliot [R] | Sen. Roger Katz [R] | Sen. Joyce Maker [R] | Rep. Dale Denno [D] |
Rep. Colleen Madigan [D] | Rep. Richard Malaby [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-05 - Senate - Accept Min Ontp Rpt RC #215 (Y: 14 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-06-01 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #214 (Y: 78 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #214 (Y: 78 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-02 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD). |
2017-06-08 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT |
2017-06-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-07 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-260) in concurrence |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-260) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-06-05 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 215 Yeas 14 - Nays 18 - Excused 3 - Absent 0 |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report FAILED |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Reports Read |
2017-06-01 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-01 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-260). |
2017-06-01 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-06-01 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-260) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-06-01 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2017-06-01 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 214 (Yeas 78 - Nays 61 - Absent 11 - Excused 1) |
2017-06-01 | House | On motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-06-01 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2017-05-31 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-30 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-25 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-25 | House | Later today assigned. |
2017-05-25 | House | On motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2017-05-25 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence |
2017-02-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-02-02 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2017-02-02 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |