ME LD351 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - PREVAILED
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - PREVAILED
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Authorize the Provision of Insurance on Student Loans
Title
An Act To Authorize the Provision of Insurance on Student Loans
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - Senate - Enact-emer 2/3 Elect RC #27 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - Enactment - Emer RC #18 (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - Enactment - Emer RC #18 (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | Senate | PREVAILED |
2013-04-03 | Senate | (35 -Yeas, 0 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 0 -Absent) |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Roll Call Number 27 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. (Roll Call Ordered) |
2013-04-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-04-02 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 18 (Yeas 142 - Nays 1 - Absent 8 - Excused 0) |
2013-04-02 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-03-28 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-03-28 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-8). |
2013-03-28 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2013-03-28 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. |
2013-03-27 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-8). |
2013-03-27 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Cleveland, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-8) READ and ADOPTED. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2013-02-12 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-02-12 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator Millett of Cumberland REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS |
2013-02-12 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS |