ME LD343 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Facilitate a Change of Location for Agency Liquor Stores
Title
An Act To Facilitate a Change of Location for Agency Liquor Stores
Sponsors
Sen. Justin Alfond [D] | Sen. Joseph Brannigan [D] | Rep. Stacey Fitts [R] | Sen. Seth Goodall [D] |
Rep. Charles Theriault [D] | Rep. John Tuttle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-16 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2011-05-16 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-05-16 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2011-05-12 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-05-12 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-68) | |
2011-05-12 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2011-05-12 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative RICHARDSON of Carmel, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2011-05-11 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2011-05-10 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME And PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-68) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2011-05-10 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Rosen, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2011-05-05 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2011-05-05 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED READ ONCE Committee Amendment "A" (S-68) READ and ADOPTED | |
2011-02-08 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-02-08 | (H) Bill REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. | |
2011-02-08 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2011-02-08 | (S) On motion by Senator Farnham of Penobscot REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS | |
2011-02-08 | (S) suggested and ordered printed | |
2011-02-08 | (S) Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS |