ME LD341 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Directing the Maine Public Employees Retirement System To Study and Report on How Statewide Retirement Systems Affected by the Windfall Elimination Provision and Government Pension Offset Can Cooperate on Solutions
Title
Resolve, Directing the Maine Public Employees Retirement System To Study and Report on How Statewide Retirement Systems Affected by the Windfall Elimination Provision and Government Pension Offset Can Cooperate on Solutions
Sponsors
Sen. Harold Stewart [R] | Rep. Richard Bradstreet [R] | Rep. Benjamin Collings [D] | Rep. Jeffery Hanley [R] |
Sen. Joseph Rafferty [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-15 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-15 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2021-06-14 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-14 | House | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-203) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-251) thereto. |
2021-06-14 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-14 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-203) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-251) thereto ADOPTED. |
2021-06-14 | House | Senate Amendment "A" (S-251) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-203) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-14 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-203) was READ. |
2021-06-14 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-14 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-203) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-251) thereto |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-203) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-251) thereto READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator STEWART of Aroostook Senate Amendment "A" (S-251) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-203) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-203) READ |
2021-06-14 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Subsequently Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-08 | Senate | On motion by Senator HICKMAN of Kennebec Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE of the Report |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Report READ |
2021-06-07 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2021-05-10 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2021-05-10 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on February 4, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |