ME LD330 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Protect Rights and Privileges Granted under the United States Constitution and the Constitution of Maine
Title
An Act To Protect Rights and Privileges Granted under the United States Constitution and the Constitution of Maine
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #290 (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-18 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #292 (Y: 80 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-06-18 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #292 (Y: 80 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-19 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD). |
2015-06-19 | Senate | On motion by Senator BURNS of Washington The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of Minority OUGHT TO PASS AS AMENDED Report AND PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-462) , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2015-06-19 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-19 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-462) , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-462) READ and ADOPTED , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 290 20 Yeas - 15 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent PREVAILED |
2015-06-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator BURNS of Washington The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Reports READ |
2015-06-18 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-18 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 292 (Yeas 80 - Nays 61 - Absent 10 - Excused 0) |
2015-06-18 | House | On motion of Representative McCABE of Skowhegan, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2015-06-18 | House | Reports READ. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator Burns of Washington, REFERRED to the Committee on Judiciary, in concurrence. |
2015-02-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-02-10 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2015-02-10 | House | Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed. |