ME LD325 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-29 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-29 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Strengthen Recycling of Single-use Plastic Shopping Bags
Title
An Act To Strengthen Recycling of Single-use Plastic Shopping Bags
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-29 - Senate - Accept Min Ontp Rpt RC #42 (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #38 (Y: 62 N: 84 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2015-04-28 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #38 (Y: 62 N: 84 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-29 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD). |
2015-04-29 | Senate | On motion by Senator SAVIELLO of Franklin the Minority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED , in concurrence. Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 42 24 Yeas - 10 Nays- 0 Excused - 1 Absent PREVAILED |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Reports READ |
2015-04-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-04-28 | House | Subsequently, On motion of Representative McCABE of Skowhegan, the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2015-04-28 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 38 (Yeas 62 - Nays 84 - Absent 5 - Excused 0) |
2015-04-28 | House | Motion of Representative WELSH of Rockport to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report FAILED. |
2015-04-28 | House | Reports READ. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin REFERRED to the Committee on Environment and Natural Resources, in concurrence. |
2015-02-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-02-10 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES. |
2015-02-10 | House | Committee on Environment and Natural Resources suggested and ordered printed. |