ME LD313 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-11 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-11 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Create a Sustainable Solution to the Handling, Management and Disposal of Solid Waste in the State
Title
An Act To Create a Sustainable Solution to the Handling, Management and Disposal of Solid Waste in the State
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Campbell [R] | Sen. Thomas Saviello [R] | Rep. Robert Duchesne [D] | Rep. Denise Harlow [D] |
Rep. Deane Rykerson [D] | Rep. Joan Welsh [D] | Rep. Dustin White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-11 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2016-04-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-04-11 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-616) AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-640) thereto , in concurrence. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-616) As Amended By House Amendment "A" (H-640) thereto ADOPTED , in concurrence. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | House Amendment "A" (H-640) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-616) READ and ADOPTED , in concurrence. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-616) READ |
2016-04-08 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2016-04-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-04-07 | House | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee "A" (H-616) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-640) thereto. |
2016-04-07 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2016-04-07 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-616) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-640) thereto ADOPTED. |
2016-04-07 | House | On motion of Representative WELSH of Rockport, House Amendment "A" (H-640) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-616) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2016-04-07 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-616) was READ. |
2016-04-07 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2016-04-07 | House | Subsequently, The Committee Report was ACCEPTED. |
2016-04-07 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2016-04-05 | House | Unfinished Business |
2016-04-04 | House | Unfinished Business |
2016-04-01 | House | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-31 | House | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-30 | House | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-30 | House | Later today assigned. |
2016-03-30 | House | On motion of Representative FREDETTE of Newport, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of the Committee Report. |
2016-03-30 | House | The Committee Report was READ. |
2016-03-30 | House | On OBJECTION of Representative FREDETTE of Newport REMOVED. |
2016-03-30 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2015-07-21 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. , in concurrence. |
2015-06-30 | House | Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. in concurrence |
2015-02-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin REFERRED to the Committee on Environment and Natural Resources, in concurrence. |
2015-02-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-02-10 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES. |
2015-02-10 | House | Committee on Environment and Natural Resources suggested and ordered printed. |