ME LD303 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-01 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-01 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Authorize the Public Advocate To Publish and Distribute Consumer Information
Title
An Act To Authorize the Public Advocate To Publish and Distribute Consumer Information
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Macdonald [D] | Rep. Ralph Chapman [D] | Sen. James Dill [D] | Rep. Gay Grant [D] |
Sen. Linda Sanborn [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-30 - House - Enactment RC #57 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-01 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2013-04-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-04-30 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 57 (Yeas 144 - Nays 0 - Absent 7 - Excused 0) |
2013-04-30 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-46), in concurrence. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Cleveland, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-46) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | On motion by Senator CLEVELAND of Androscoggin the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2013-04-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-04-23 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-46). |
2013-04-23 | House | READ the Second Time. |
2013-04-23 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. |
2013-04-10 | House | TOMORROW ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING. |
2013-04-10 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-46) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2013-04-10 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2013-04-10 | House | On motion of Representative HOBBINS of Saco, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2013-04-10 | House | Reports READ. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator Cleveland of Androscoggin, REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY and ordered printed, in concurrence. |
2013-02-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-02-07 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY. |
2013-02-07 | House | Committee on Energy, Utilities and Technology suggested and ordered printed. |