ME LD298 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-07-19 - Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Authorize a General Fund Bond Issue To Fund Capital Improvements and Equipment for Career and Technical Education Centers and Regions To Prepare Students To Join Maine's Workforce

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Authorize a General Fund Bond Issue To Fund Capital Improvements and Equipment for Career and Technical Education Centers and Regions To Prepare Students To Join Maine's Workforce

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-19HouseCarried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302.
2021-07-13JointCarry Over Approved
2021-07-13JointCarry Over Requested
2021-03-30HouseCarried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
2021-02-01HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
2021-02-01HouseReceived by the Clerk of the House on February 1, 2021.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback