ME LD294 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Name the Bridge over the Penobscot River in the Towns of Enfield and Howland King's Bridge
Title
Resolve, To Name the Bridge over the Penobscot River in the Towns of Enfield and Howland King's Bridge
Sponsors
Rep. Sheldon Hanington [R] | Sen. James Dill [D] | Sen. Kimberley Rosen [R] | Rep. Stephen Stanley [D] |
Rep. Beth Turner [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2017-03-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-28 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2017-03-28 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith |
2017-03-23 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2017-03-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-16 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2017-03-16 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2017-03-16 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary. Report Accepted. |
2017-03-14 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-01-31 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION in concurrence |
2017-01-31 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-01-31 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION. |
2017-01-31 | House | Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed. |