ME LD279 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Sustain Maine's Aviation Industry by Extending the Exemption from Sales and Use Tax for Aircraft and Parts
Title
An Act To Sustain Maine's Aviation Industry by Extending the Exemption from Sales and Use Tax for Aircraft and Parts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-19 - House - Enactment RC #381 (Y: 132 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-27 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-27 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-27 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-06-27 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-27 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-55) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-335) thereto |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-55) As Amended By Senate Amendment "A" (S-335) thereto , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Committee Amendment "A" (S-55) As Amended By Senate Amendment "A" (S-335) READ and ADOPTED thereto , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-335) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-55) READ and ADOPTED |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules RECONSIDER ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (S-55) |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules RECONSIDER PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-55) |
2013-06-27 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by Senator HILL of York. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | On motion by Senator HILL of York, PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence. |
2013-06-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-19 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 381 (Yeas 132 - Nays 16 - Absent 3 - Excused 0) |
2013-06-19 | House | Subsequently, PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-06-19 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2013-06-18 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-06-17 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-06-14 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-06-13 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-06-12 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-06-11 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-06-10 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-06-07 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-06-06 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-06-05 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-06-04 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-06-03 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-05-31 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-05-30 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-05-29 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-05-28 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-05-23 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-05-22 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-05-21 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-05-20 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-05-16 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-05-15 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-05-15 | House | Later today assigned. |
2013-05-15 | House | On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, TABLED pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-05-08 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-05-08 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-55) |
2013-05-08 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2013-05-08 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2013-05-08 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-55). |
2013-05-08 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Cleveland, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-55) READ and ADOPTED. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2013-02-07 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-02-07 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator Haskell of Cumberland REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Committee on TAXATION suggested and ordered printed |