ME LD278 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-01 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-01 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Provide Greater Access to Capital for Certain Businesses through Assignment of Benefits under the Business Equipment Tax Reimbursement Program and the Maine Employment Tax Increment Financing Program
Title
An Act To Provide Greater Access to Capital for Certain Businesses through Assignment of Benefits under the Business Equipment Tax Reimbursement Program and the Maine Employment Tax Increment Financing Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-01 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2013-04-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-04-30 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-04-25 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-04-25 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-21). |
2013-04-25 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2013-04-25 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. |
2013-04-24 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-21). |
2013-04-23 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Cleveland, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-21) READ and ADOPTED . |
2013-04-10 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Report ACCEPTED. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by the President. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-04-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator JACKSON of Aroostook TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF REPORT. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Report READ. |
2013-02-07 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-02-07 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator Haskell of Cumberland REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Committee on TAXATION suggested and ordered printed |