ME LD278 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-12 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-12 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Summary
An Act To Bring Equity to the Sea Urchin License Fees
Title
An Act To Bring Equity to the Sea Urchin License Fees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-12 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2009-06-12 | (S) On motion by Senator DIAMOND of Cumberland taken from the Special Appropriations Table | |
2009-05-13 | (S) On motion by Senator DIAMOND of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT in concurrence | |
2009-05-13 | (S) Subsequently Taken from the table by the President | |
2009-05-13 | (S) On motion by Senator BARTLETT of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ENACTMENT in concurrence | |
2009-05-12 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-05-12 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2009-05-07 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-05-07 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-123) | |
2009-05-07 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2009-05-07 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2009-05-06 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2009-05-06 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2009-05-06 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-123) | |
2009-05-06 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Damon, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2009-05-05 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2009-05-05 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (S-123) READ and ADOPTED | |
2009-05-05 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2009-05-05 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED | |
2009-02-03 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-02-03 | (H) Bill REFERRED to the Committee on MARINE RESOURCES. | |
2009-02-03 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2009-02-03 | (S) On motion by Senator Sullivan of York REFERRED to the Committee on MARINE RESOURCES | |
2009-02-03 | (S) Committee on Marine Resources suggested and ordered printed. |