ME LD236 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - 18 Yeas - 15 Nays- 0 Excused - 2 Absent
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - 18 Yeas - 15 Nays- 0 Excused - 2 Absent
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Protect the Privacy of Citizens from Domestic Unmanned Aerial Vehicle Use
Title
An Act To Protect the Privacy of Citizens from Domestic Unmanned Aerial Vehicle Use
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-07-09 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #370 (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-06-19 - House - Passage To Be Engrossed RC #388 (Y: 108 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-06-19 - House - Adpt Cb As Am By Sa285& Hbh563 RC #387 (Y: 115 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-06-18 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #355 (Y: 56 N: 83 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2013-06-17 - Senate - Adopt Sas-285 To Cbs-282 RC #304 (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-17 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #303 (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-17 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #302 (Y: 14 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-06-19 - House - Passage To Be Engrossed RC #388 (Y: 108 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-06-19 - House - Adpt Cb As Am By Sa285& Hbh563 RC #387 (Y: 115 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-06-18 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #355 (Y: 56 N: 83 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2013-06-17 - Senate - Adopt Sas-285 To Cbs-282 RC #304 (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-17 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #303 (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-17 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #302 (Y: 14 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-09 | Senate | 18 Yeas - 15 Nays- 0 Excused - 2 Absent |
2013-07-09 | Senate | Roll Call # 370 |
2013-07-09 | Senate | Secretary of the Senate |
2013-07-09 | Senate | Darek M. Grant |
2013-07-09 | Senate | ____________________ |
2013-07-09 | Senate | Enacted In Senate, June 27, 2013, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 18 in the affirmative and 15 in the negative, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by Senator CAIN of Penobscot. PASSED TO BE ENACTED , in concurrence. |
2013-06-20 | Senate | On motion by Senator HILL of York, PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence. |
2013-06-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-19 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-06-19 | Senate | On motion by Senator GOODALL of Sagadahoc, the Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED to Passage to be Engrossed as Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (S-282) as Amended by House Amendment "B" (H-563) and Senate Amendment "A" (S-285) thereto. |
2013-06-19 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-19 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2013-06-19 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 388 (Yeas 108 - Nays 39 - Absent 4 - Excused 0) |
2013-06-19 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (S-282) as Amended by House Amendment "B" (H-563) and Senate Amendment "A" (S-285) thereto. |
2013-06-19 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2013-06-19 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 387 (Yeas 115 - Nays 33 - Absent 3 - Excused 0) |
2013-06-19 | House | Committee Amendment "B" (S-282) as Amended by House Amendment "B" (H-563) and Senate Amendment "A" (S-285) thereto was ADOPTED. |
2013-06-19 | House | Senate Amendment "A" (S-285) to Committee Amendment "B" (S-282) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2013-06-19 | House | Subsequently, on motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, House Amendment "B" (H-563) to Committee Amendment "B" (S-282) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2013-06-19 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2013-06-18 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-06-18 | House | Later today assigned. |
2013-06-18 | House | On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham TABLED pending ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "B" (S-282). |
2013-06-18 | House | Committee Amendment "B" (S-282) was READ. |
2013-06-18 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2013-06-18 | House | On motion of Representative PRIEST of Brunswick, the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2013-06-18 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 355 (Yeas 56 - Nays 83 - Absent 12 - Excused 0) |
2013-06-18 | House | On motion of Representative PRIEST of Brunswick, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report FAILED. |
2013-06-18 | House | Reports READ. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "B" (S-282) As Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-285) thereto. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Cleveland, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2013-06-17 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Senator TUTTLE of York OBJECTED to suspension of the Rules for the purpose of giving this Bill a second reading at this time. |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Committee Amendment "B" (S-282) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-285) thereto ADOPTED. |
2013-06-17 | Senate | PREVAILED |
2013-06-17 | Senate | (19 -Yeas, 16 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 0 -Absent) |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Roll Call Number 304 |
2013-06-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator PATRICK of Oxford, Senate Amendment "A" (S-285) to Committee Amendment "B" (S-282) READ and ADOPTED. (Remarks Made) (Roll Call Ordered) |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Committee Amendment "B" (S-282) READ. |
2013-06-17 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-06-17 | Senate | PREVAILED |
2013-06-17 | Senate | (23 -Yeas, 12 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 0 -Absent) |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Roll Call Number 303 |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Subsequently, the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (S-282) Report ACCEPTED. (Remarks Made) (Roll Call Ordered) |
2013-06-17 | Senate | FAILED |
2013-06-17 | Senate | (14 -Yeas, 21 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 0 -Absent) |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Roll Call Number 302 |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Motion by Senator VALENTINO of York to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended By Committee Amendment "A" (S-281) Report FAILED. (Remarks Made) (Roll Call Ordered) |
2013-06-17 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by the President. |
2013-06-14 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-06-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator TUTTLE of York TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT. |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2013-02-05 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-02-05 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | On motion by Senator Valentino of York REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Committee on JUDICIARY suggested and ordered printed |