ME LD235 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Failed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Failed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Improve Insurance Coverage for First Responders
Title
An Act To Improve Insurance Coverage for First Responders
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Johnson [D] | Rep. Ricky Long [R] | Sen. David Dutremble [D] | Rep. John Tuttle [D] |
Rep. Michel Lajoie [D] | Rep. Jethro Pease [R] | Rep. Sharon Treat [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-07-09 - House - Enactment - Mandate RC #421 (Y: 93 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2013-07-09 - Senate - Enact-mandate 2/3 Elect RC #377 (Y: 17 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-06-27 - Senate - Pass To Be Engrossed As Amend RC #358 (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - House - Acc Report 'a' Otp As Amended RC #135 (Y: 96 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - Senate - Accept Rpt 'a' Otp-a RC #99 (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-09 - Senate - Enact-mandate 2/3 Elect RC #377 (Y: 17 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-06-27 - Senate - Pass To Be Engrossed As Amend RC #358 (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - House - Acc Report 'a' Otp As Amended RC #135 (Y: 96 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - Senate - Accept Rpt 'a' Otp-a RC #99 (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-09 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD). |
2013-07-09 | Senate | 17 Yeas - 16 Nays- 0 Excused - 2 Absent |
2013-07-09 | Senate | Roll Call # 377 |
2013-07-09 | Senate | FAILED ENACTMENT 2/3 Elected Required. , in concurrence. |
2013-07-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-07-09 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 421 (Yeas 93 - Nays 49 - Absent 9 - Excused 0) |
2013-07-09 | House | In accordance with the provisions of Section 21 of Article IX of the Constitution, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House being necessary, a total was taken. |
2013-07-09 | House | FAILED PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-06-27 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-27 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-76) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-333) thereto |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | 18 Yeas - 16 Nays- 1 Excused - 0 Absent |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Roll Call # 358 |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-76) As Amended By Senate Amendment "A" (S-333) thereto , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Committee Amendment "A" (S-76) As Amended By Senate Amendment "A" (S-333) READ and ADOPTED thereto , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-333) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-76) READ and ADOPTED |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules RECONSIDER ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (S-76) |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules RECONSIDER PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-76) |
2013-06-27 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by Senator HILL of York. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | On motion by Senator HILL of York, PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence. |
2013-05-31 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-05-31 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-05-28 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-05-28 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-76). |
2013-05-28 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2013-05-28 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-76) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2013-05-28 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2013-05-28 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 135 (Yeas 96 - Nays 42 - Absent 12 - Excused 1) |
2013-05-28 | House | On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended was ACCEPTED. |
2013-05-28 | House | Reports READ. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-76). |
2013-05-23 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Cleveland, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-76) READ and ADOPTED . |
2013-05-22 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | PREVAILED |
2013-05-22 | Senate | (18 -Yeas, 17 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 0 -Absent) |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Roll Call Number 99 |
2013-05-22 | Senate | On motion by Senator PATRICK of Oxford Report "A" Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-76) Report ACCEPTED . (Remarks Made) (Roll Call Ordered) |
2013-05-22 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by the President. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-05-20 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-05-16 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-05-15 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-05-14 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-05-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator JACKSON of Aroostook, Tabled Until Later in Today's Session pending the motion by Senator Patrick of Oxford to ACCEPT Report A Ought to Pass As Amended. |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Senator PATRICK of Oxford moved to ACCEPT Report A Ought to Pass as Amended. |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2013-02-05 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-02-05 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | On motion by Senator Patrick of Oxford REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT suggested and ordered printed |