ME LD2268 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on April 10 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 10 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Implement the Recommendations of the Commission Regarding Foreign-trained Physicians Living in Maine to Establish a Sponsorship Program for Foreign-trained Physicians
Title
An Act to Implement the Recommendations of the Commission Regarding Foreign-trained Physicians Living in Maine to Establish a Sponsorship Program for Foreign-trained Physicians
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2024-04-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-04-10 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-926), in concurrence. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-926) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2024-04-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-04-09 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-926). |
2024-04-09 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2024-04-09 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2024-04-05 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2024-03-20 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2024-03-20 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2024-03-14 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES in concurrence |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2024-03-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-14 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES |
2024-03-14 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2024-03-14 | House | Representative PERRY for the Joint Standing Committee on Health Coverage, Insurance and Financial Services pursuant to Resolve 2023, chapter 93, section 8 reports that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES and printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |