ME LD2249 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Protect the Fund for a Healthy Maine
Title
An Act to Protect the Fund for a Healthy Maine
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2024-03-21 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-21 | House | The Bill and accompanying papers were INDEFINITELY POSTPONED. |
2024-03-21 | House | The Report was READ. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2024-03-20 | Senate | On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin Bill and accompanying papers INDEFINITELY POSTPONED |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2024-03-05 | Senate | On motion by Senator BENNETT of Oxford Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE of the Report |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Report READ |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Services pursuant to Resolve 2023, chapter 100, section 7. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Reported by Senator BALDACCI of Penobscot for the Joint Standing Committee on Health and Human |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=2249&snum=131 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0969&item=1&snum=131 |