ME LD2230 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, to Require a Stakeholder Group to Participate in the Development of Rules Regarding Youth Camps
Title
Resolve, to Require a Stakeholder Group to Participate in the Development of Rules Regarding Youth Camps
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2024-04-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-04-10 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2024-04-10 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2024-04-09 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-04-09 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-645). |
2024-04-09 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2024-04-09 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-645). |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-645) READ and ADOPTED. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2024-04-02 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2024-03-14 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2024-03-14 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2024-02-27 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-02-27 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |