ME LD2206 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding Incentives for Heat Pumps and Other Weatherization Products and Services
Title
An Act Regarding Incentives for Heat Pumps and Other Weatherization Products and Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2024-03-04 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2024-02-22 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2024-02-22 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2024-02-08 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-02-08 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=2206&snum=131 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0942&item=1&snum=131 |