ME LD2189 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Regarding Legislative Review of Portions of Chapter 41: Special Restrictions on Pesticide Use, a Major Substantive Rule of the Department of Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry, Board of Pesticides Control
Title
Resolve, Regarding Legislative Review of Portions of Chapter 41: Special Restrictions on Pesticide Use, a Major Substantive Rule of the Department of Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry, Board of Pesticides Control
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2024-03-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-19 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With Acceptance of The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report AND PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-776) AND House Amendment "A" (H-785) in concurrence |
2024-03-13 | House | The House INSISTED on PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-776) and House Amendment "A" (H-785) ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-776) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-776) READ and ADOPTED |
2024-03-12 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-776) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-776) READ and ADOPTED |
2024-03-12 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2024-03-05 | Senate | On motion by Senator STEWART of Aroostook TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending motion by Senator INGWERSEN of York to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report in Concurrence. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senator INGWERSEN of York moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report in Concurrence. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Reports READ |
2024-02-29 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-02-29 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-776) and House Amendment "A" (H-785) |
2024-02-29 | House | On motion of Representative PLUECKER of Warren, House Amendment "A" (H-785) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2024-02-29 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2024-02-29 | House | Subsequently, Committee Amendment "A" (H-776) was ADOPTED. |
2024-02-29 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2024-02-28 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-02-28 | House | Later today assigned. |
2024-02-28 | House | On motion of Representative PLUECKER of Warren, the Resolve was TABLED pending ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (H-776) |
2024-02-28 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-776) was READ. |
2024-02-28 | House | The Resolve was READ ONCE. |
2024-02-28 | House | On motion of Representative PLUECKER of Warren, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2024-02-28 | House | Reports READ. |
2024-02-27 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/OTP |
2024-02-14 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2024-02-14 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2024-01-23 | Senate | On motion by Senator Ingwersen of York REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218, in concurrence. |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2024-01-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-01-23 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |
2024-01-23 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2024-01-23 | House | Representative PLUECKER for the Department of Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 5, section 8072, reports that the Resolve be REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |