ME LD2180 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - FINALLY PASSED - 2/3 Elected Required in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - FINALLY PASSED - 2/3 Elected Required in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Regarding Legislative Review of Portions of Chapter 101: Maine Unified Special Education Regulation Birth to Age Twenty-Two, a Major Substantive Rule of the Department of Education
Title
Resolve, Regarding Legislative Review of Portions of Chapter 101: Maine Unified Special Education Regulation Birth to Age Twenty-Two, a Major Substantive Rule of the Department of Education
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED - 2/3 Elected Required in concurrence |
2024-04-17 | Senate | On Motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2024-03-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-28 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2024-03-28 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-858), in concurrence. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-858) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2024-03-27 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-27 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-858). |
2024-03-27 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2024-03-27 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2024-03-22 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2024-02-20 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2024-02-20 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2024-01-23 | Senate | On motion by Senator Rafferty of York REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218, in concurrence. |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2024-01-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-01-23 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |
2024-01-23 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2024-01-23 | House | Representative BRENNAN for the Department of Education pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 5, section 8072, reports that the Resolve be REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |