ME LD2130 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Prohibit Unauthorized Paramilitary Training
Title
An Act to Prohibit Unauthorized Paramilitary Training
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Senate - Enactment RC #671 (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Reconsider RC #670 (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-04-03 - House - Enactment RC #460 (Y: 72 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - Table Until Later RC #389 (Y: 74 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Accept Majority Ought To Pass As Amended Report RC #541 (Y: 18 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #372 (Y: 66 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Reconsider RC #670 (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-04-03 - House - Enactment RC #460 (Y: 72 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - Table Until Later RC #389 (Y: 74 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Accept Majority Ought To Pass As Amended Report RC #541 (Y: 18 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #372 (Y: 66 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Senate | Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 670 Yeas 16 - Nays 18 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 FAILED |
2024-04-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator BENNETT of Oxford for RECONSIDERATION |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2024-04-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator STEWART of Aroostook Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2024-04-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-04-03 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 460 (Yeas 72 - Nays 71 - Absent 8 - Excused 0) |
2024-04-03 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2024-04-03 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2024-04-02 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-04-01 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-03-28 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-03-27 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-03-25 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-03-21 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-03-20 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-03-19 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-03-14 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-03-13 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-03-12 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-03-07 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-03-06 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-03-05 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-02-29 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-02-29 | House | Later today assigned. (Roll Call Ordered) |
2024-02-29 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 389 (Yeas 74 - Nays 68 - Absent 8 - Excused 0 - Vacant - 1) |
2024-02-29 | House | Subsequently, the Bill was TABLED pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED. |
2024-02-29 | House | On motion of Representative FAULKINGHAM of Winter Harbor, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Bill was TABLED pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED. |
2024-02-29 | House | On motion of Representative TERRY of Gorham, TABLED pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-757), in concurrence. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2024-02-22 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-757) READ and ADOPTED |
2024-02-22 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 541 Yeas 18 - Nays 14 - Excused 3 - Absent 0 PREVAILED |
2024-02-22 | Senate | On motion by Senator BEEBE-CENTER of Knox the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Reports Read |
2024-02-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-02-21 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-757). |
2024-02-21 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2024-02-21 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-757) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2024-02-21 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2024-02-21 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 372 (Yeas 66 - Nays 60 - Absent 24 - Excused 0 - Vacant 1) |
2024-02-21 | House | On motion of Representative SALISBURY of Westbrook, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2024-02-21 | House | Reports READ. |
2024-02-20 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2024-02-07 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2024-02-07 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2024-01-09 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY in concurrence |
2024-01-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-01-03 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2024-01-03 | House | Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed. |