ME LD2128 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding Nonemergency Transportation for MaineCare Members
Title
An Act Regarding Nonemergency Transportation for MaineCare Members
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2024-02-29 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2024-02-15 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2024-02-15 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2024-01-09 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence |
2024-01-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-01-03 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2024-01-03 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=2128&snum=131 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP1352&item=1&snum=131 |