ME LD212 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - Carry Over Approved
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to Authorize a General Fund Bond Issue to Upgrade Municipal Culverts at Stream Crossings

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act to Authorize a General Fund Bond Issue to Upgrade Municipal Culverts at Stream Crossings

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-10JointCarry Over Approved
2023-07-26HouseCarried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847.
2023-07-25JointCarry Over Approved
2023-07-17JointCarry Over Requested
2023-03-30HouseCarried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594.
2023-01-24SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS in concurrence
2023-01-24HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-01-24HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS.
2023-01-24HouseCommittee on Appropriations and Financial Affairs suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback