ME LD211 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Open Maine's Primaries and Permit Unenrolled Voters To Cast Ballots in Primary Elections
Title
An Act To Open Maine's Primaries and Permit Unenrolled Voters To Cast Ballots in Primary Elections
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-28 - Senate - Accept Maj Ontp Rpt RC #139 (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #126 (Y: 89 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Table Until Later RC #125 (Y: 22 N: 113 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2019-05-23 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #126 (Y: 89 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Table Until Later RC #125 (Y: 22 N: 113 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 139 Yeas 18 - Nays 16 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator LUCHINI of Hancock the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Reports Read |
2019-05-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-23 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 126 (Yeas 89 - Nays 45 - Absent 14 - Excused 2 Vacant 1) |
2019-05-23 | House | Subsequently, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-05-23 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 125 (Yeas 22 - Nays 113 - Absent 13 - Excused 2 Vacant 1) |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion of Representative ACKLEY of Monmouth to TABLE until later in today's session FAILED. |
2019-05-23 | House | Representative SCHNECK of Bangor moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2019-05-23 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2019-01-22 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-22 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2019-01-22 | House | Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |