ME LD2107 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding Department of Education Reliance on Criminal Background Checks Required by the Department of Health and Human Services
Title
An Act Regarding Department of Education Reliance on Criminal Background Checks Required by the Department of Health and Human Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2024-02-28 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2024-02-22 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2024-02-22 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2024-01-03 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-01-03 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=2107&snum=131 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0900&item=1&snum=131 |