ME LD1992 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Related to the Electronic Registration and Tagging of Turkey
Title
An Act Related to the Electronic Registration and Tagging of Turkey
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Senate | Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-03-31 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-31 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-878) in concurrence |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-878) READ and ADOPTED |
2022-03-31 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2022-03-31 | Senate | On motion by Senator DILL of Penobscot the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Reports Read |
2022-03-29 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-29 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-878). |
2022-03-29 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2022-03-29 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-878) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2022-03-29 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2022-03-29 | House | On motion of Representative LANDRY of Farmington, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2022-03-29 | House | Reports READ. |
2022-03-29 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2022-03-02 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2022-03-02 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2022-02-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator Dill of Penobscot REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218, in concurrence. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2022-02-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-02-16 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |
2022-02-16 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2022-02-16 | House | Representative LANDRY for the Joint Standing Committee on Inland Fisheries and Wildlife pursuant to Public Law 2021, chapter 121, section 7, reports that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |