ME LD1989 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Authorize School Administrative District No. 6 To Lease a Former Administrative Building for a Term of Not More than 20 Years
Title
An Act To Authorize School Administrative District No. 6 To Lease a Former Administrative Building for a Term of Not More than 20 Years
Sponsors
Rep. Nathan Carlow [R] | Rep. Susan Austin [R] | Sen. Donna Bailey [D] | Rep. Mark Blier [R] |
Sen. Stacy Brenner [D] | Sen. William Diamond [D] | Rep. Lester Ordway [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-04-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-07 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-896) in concurrence |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-896) READ and ADOPTED |
2022-04-05 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2022-04-05 | Senate | On motion by Senator RAFFERTY of York the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Reports Read |
2022-03-31 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-31 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-896). |
2022-03-31 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2022-03-31 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-896) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2022-03-31 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2022-03-31 | House | On motion of Representative BRENNAN of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2022-03-31 | House | Reports READ. |
2022-03-31 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2022-03-14 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2022-03-14 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2022-03-03 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2022-02-16 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2022-02-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-02-16 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2022-02-16 | House | Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |