ME LD1922 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-13 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-13 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Allow Bargaining Agents for Public Sector Unions to Merge
Title
An Act to Allow Bargaining Agents for Public Sector Unions to Merge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-13 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2023-06-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-13 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2023-06-12 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-12 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-197). |
2023-06-12 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2023-06-12 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-197). |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-197) READ and ADOPTED. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2023-06-06 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2023-05-24 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2023-05-24 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-05-11 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-05-11 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING. |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |