ME LD1899 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-15 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-15 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Ensure Safe Entry and Access for People Seeking Health Care and Other Constitutional Rights
Title
An Act To Ensure Safe Entry and Access for People Seeking Health Care and Other Constitutional Rights
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-13 - House - Acc Report 'a' Otp As Amend RC #563 (Y: 75 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-15 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-04-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-14 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-1004) in concurrence |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-1004) READ and ADOPTED |
2022-04-14 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2022-04-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland Report A Ought to Pass as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-1004) ACCEPTED |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Reports Read |
2022-04-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-13 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-1004). |
2022-04-13 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2022-04-13 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-1004) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2022-04-13 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2022-04-13 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 563 (Yeas 75 - Nays 52 - Absent 20 - Excused 0 - Vacant 4) |
2022-04-13 | House | On motion of Representative HARNETT of Gardiner, REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended was ACCEPTED. |
2022-04-13 | House | Reports READ. |
2022-04-13 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP/OTP-AM |
2022-03-08 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2022-03-08 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2022-01-05 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY in concurrence |
2022-01-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-01-05 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2022-01-05 | House | Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed. |