ME LD1882 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-29 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-29 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Directing the Department of Health and Human Services To Review the Requirements for Certification of Micropigmentation Practitioners
Title
Resolve, Directing the Department of Health and Human Services To Review the Requirements for Certification of Micropigmentation Practitioners
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2022-03-24 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-24 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2022-03-24 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2022-03-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-09 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2022-03-09 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2022-03-09 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2022-02-24 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP |
2022-02-01 | Joint | Voted: OTP |
2022-02-01 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2022-01-05 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES in concurrence |
2022-01-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-01-05 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES. |
2022-01-05 | House | Committee on Health Coverage, Insurance and Financial Services suggested and ordered printed. |