ME LD1877 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Expand and Clarify the Areas Subject to Municipal Residency Restrictions for Sex Offenders
Title
An Act To Expand and Clarify the Areas Subject to Municipal Residency Restrictions for Sex Offenders
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2018-04-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-09 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-709), in concurrence. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-709) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2018-04-04 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-04 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-709). |
2018-04-04 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2018-04-04 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2018-03-27 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAVIS of Piscataquis The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With REFERENCE to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senator DIAMOND of Cumberland asked and received leave of the Senate to Withdraw his request for a Roll Call. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2018-03-27 | Senate | On motion by Senator JACKSON of Aroostook Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending Motion of Senator Davis to Recede and Concur Roll Call Ordered |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senator DIAMOND of Cumberland Requested a Roll Call |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senator DAVIS of Piscataquis moved for The Senate to RECEDE and CONCUR |
2018-03-22 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-22 | House | The House INSISTED on REFERENCE to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2018-03-22 | Senate | On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY in Non-concurrence |
2018-03-22 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-22 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2018-03-22 | House | Committee on State and Local Government suggested and ordered printed. |