ME LD1875 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Failed on June 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Failed on June 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, to Create a Pilot Program for Apprenticeships for Inmates
Title
Resolve, to Create a Pilot Program for Apprenticeships for Inmates
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-07 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2023-06-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator BEEBE-CENTER of Knox the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Reports Read |
2023-06-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-07 | House | On motion of Representative SALISBURY of Westbrook, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2023-06-07 | House | Reports READ. |
2023-06-05 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2023-05-16 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-05-16 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-05-04 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY in concurrence |
2023-05-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-05-03 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2023-05-03 | House | Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1875&snum=131 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP1200&item=1&snum=131 |