ME LD1858 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Ensure Effective Teaching and School Leadership
Title
An Act To Ensure Effective Teaching and School Leadership
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-05 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2012-04-04 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith. | |
2012-04-04 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-900), in concurrence. | |
2012-04-04 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-900) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. | |
2012-04-04 | (S) READ ONCE. | |
2012-04-04 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. | |
2012-04-04 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-04-04 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-900) | |
2012-04-04 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2012-04-04 | (H) Under suspension of the rules | |
2012-04-04 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2012-03-13 | (S) On motion by Senator Langley of Hancock, REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2012-03-12 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-03-12 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. | |
2012-03-12 | (H) Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |