ME LD1856 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-14 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-14 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, to Study the Establishment of a Public Option Health Benefit Plan
Title
Resolve, to Study the Establishment of a Public Option Health Benefit Plan
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-13 - Senate - Accept Majority Ought To Pass As Amended Report RC #312 (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-12 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #183 (Y: 79 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-06-12 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #183 (Y: 79 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-14 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2023-06-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-14 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-401) in concurrence |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-401) READ and ADOPTED |
2023-06-13 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 312 Yeas 22 - Nays 12 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 PREVAILED |
2023-06-13 | Senate | On motion by Senator BAILEY of York The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Reports READ |
2023-06-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-12 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-401). |
2023-06-12 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2023-06-12 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-401) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2023-06-12 | House | The Resolve was READ ONCE. |
2023-06-12 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 183 (Yeas 79 - Nays 62 - Absent 9 - Excused 0 - Vacant 1) |
2023-06-12 | House | On motion of Representative PERRY of Calais, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2023-06-12 | House | Reports READ. |
2023-06-08 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2023-05-17 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-05-17 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-05-03 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES in concurrence |
2023-05-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-05-02 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES. |
2023-05-02 | House | Committee on Health Coverage, Insurance and Financial Services suggested and ordered printed. |