ME LD1845 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-05 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-05 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Education Statutes
Title
An Act To Amend the Education Statutes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-03-31 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-31 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-852), in concurrence. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-852) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2022-03-29 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-29 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-852). |
2022-03-29 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2022-03-29 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2022-03-28 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2022-01-27 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2022-01-20 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-12-20 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-12-20 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on December 20, 2021. |