ME LD1835 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-09 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-09 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Laws Governing Storm Water Management To Provide an Exemption for Mountain Bike Trails
Title
An Act To Amend the Laws Governing Storm Water Management To Provide an Exemption for Mountain Bike Trails
Sponsors
Sen. Matthea Larsen Daughtry [D] | Rep. Arthur Bell [D] | Sen. Anne Carney [D] | Sen. Nathan Libby [D] |
Rep. Rebecca Millett [D] | Rep. Stanley Zeigler [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2022-02-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-02-23 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-02-23 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2022-02-16 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-02-16 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2022-02-16 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2022-02-16 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2022-01-31 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP |
2022-01-24 | Joint | Voted: OTP |
2022-01-24 | Joint | Work Session Reconsidered |
2022-01-19 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2022-01-19 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2022-01-19 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on December 20, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |