ME LD1832 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Implement Recommendations of the Right To Know Advisory Committee Concerning Remote Participation
Title
An Act To Implement Recommendations of the Right To Know Advisory Committee Concerning Remote Participation
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2018-04-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator KEIM of Oxford the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Reports Read |
2018-04-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-09 | House | On motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2018-04-09 | House | Reports READ. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | On motion by Senator Keim of Oxford REFERRED to the Committee on Judiciary and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218, in concurrence. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2018-02-08 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-02-08 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY |
2018-02-08 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2018-02-08 | House | Representative MOONEN for the Joint Standing Committee on Judiciary pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 1, section 411, subsection 6, paragraph G reports that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY and printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1832&snum=128 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP1274&item=1&snum=128 |