ME LD1819 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Harmonize State Income Tax Law and the Centralized Partnership Audit Rules of the Federal Internal Revenue Code of 1986

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Harmonize State Income Tax Law and the Centralized Partnership Audit Rules of the Federal Internal Revenue Code of 1986

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-06-13HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-13HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-06-12SenateOrdered sent down forthwith.
2019-06-12SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-570), in concurrence.
2019-06-12SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-570) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
2019-06-12SenateREAD ONCE.
2019-06-12SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
2019-06-12HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-12HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-570).
2019-06-12HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2019-06-12HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2019-06-03SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION in concurrence
2019-06-03HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-03HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION.
2019-06-03HouseCommittee on Taxation suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback