ME LD1816 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Ensure the Safety and Well-being of Infants Affected by Substance Exposure
Title
An Act To Ensure the Safety and Well-being of Infants Affected by Substance Exposure
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-10 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-07 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-06 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-06 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2019-06-06 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-06-06 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-06-03 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence |
2019-06-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-03 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2019-06-03 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |