ME LD1807 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-13 - (S) FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-13 - (S) FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Directing the Maine Turnpike Authority To Place Signs on Interstate 95 Directing Motorists to the Southern Maine Veterans Memorial Cemetery in Springvale
Title
Resolve, Directing the Maine Turnpike Authority To Place Signs on Interstate 95 Directing Motorists to the Southern Maine Veterans Memorial Cemetery in Springvale
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-13 | (S) FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. | |
2012-03-12 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-03-12 | (H) FINALLY PASSED. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) The Resolve was READ ONCE. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) On motion of Representative CEBRA of Naples, the Majority Ought to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Reports READ. | |
2012-03-07 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. | |
2012-03-07 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. | |
2012-03-07 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Rosen, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2012-03-06 | (S) ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. | |
2012-03-06 | (S) READ ONCE. | |
2012-03-06 | (S) On motion by Senator COLLINS of York, the Majority Ought to Pass Report ACCEPTED . | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Reports READ. | |
2012-02-08 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-02-08 | (H) Resolve REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION. | |
2012-02-07 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. | |
2012-02-07 | (S) On motion by Senator Collins of York REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION | |
2012-02-07 | (S) Committee on TRANSPORTATION suggested and ordered printed |