ME LD1803 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Attract and Retain Firefighters and Emergency Medical Services Personnel through the Maine Length of Service Award Program
Title
An Act To Attract and Retain Firefighters and Emergency Medical Services Personnel through the Maine Length of Service Award Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-04-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-25 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-04-25 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-25 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-756) and Senate Amendment "A" (S-627). |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2022-04-25 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-756) AND Senate Amendment "A" (S-627) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-756) ADOPTED |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-627) READ and ADOPTED |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Under further suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (H-756) was ADOPTED |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-756) |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-02-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-02-23 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-756), in concurrence. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-756) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2022-02-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-02-10 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-756). |
2022-02-10 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2022-02-10 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2022-01-28 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2022-01-19 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2022-01-19 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-12-07 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-12-07 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on December 7, 2021. |