ME LD180 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Regarding the Storage of Consumer Fireworks
Title
Resolve, Regarding the Storage of Consumer Fireworks
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-15 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-14 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-557) in concurrence |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-557) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-14 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator DESCHAMBAULT of York Report A Ought to Pass As Amended ACCEPTED |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-06-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-10 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-557). |
2021-06-10 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-10 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-557) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-10 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-10 | House | On motion of Representative WARREN of Hallowell, REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-10 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/OTP/ONTP |
2021-06-10 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-29 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-03-29 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-02-17 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-01-21 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-01-21 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on January 21, 2021. |