ME LD1798 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Ensure Health Insurance Coverage for Certain Adults with Disabilities
Title
An Act To Ensure Health Insurance Coverage for Certain Adults with Disabilities
Sponsors
Rep. Rebecca Millett [D] | Rep. Poppy Arford [D] | Rep. Heidi Brooks [D] | Rep. Richard Evans [D] |
Rep. Ryan Fecteau [D] | Rep. Kristi Mathieson [D] | Sen. Heather Sanborn [D] | Rep. Denise Tepler [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-03-22 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-22 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-776), in concurrence. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-776) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2022-02-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-02-23 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-776). |
2022-02-23 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2022-02-23 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2022-02-22 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2022-01-25 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2022-01-25 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2022-01-20 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-12-07 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-12-07 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on December 7, 2021. |