ME LD1793 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-09 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-09 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Support Statewide Economic Recovery through Strategic Investments
Title
An Act To Support Statewide Economic Recovery through Strategic Investments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-10 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #449 (Y: 98 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-02-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-02-23 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-760) in concurrence |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-760) READ and ADOPTED |
2022-02-16 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2022-02-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator CURRY of Waldo the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Reports Read |
2022-02-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-02-10 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-760). |
2022-02-10 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-760) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2022-02-10 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2022-02-10 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 449 (Yeas 98 - Nays 33 - Absent 17 - Excused 0 - Vacant 3) |
2022-02-10 | House | On motion of Representative ROBERTS of South Berwick, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2022-02-10 | House | Reports READ. |
2022-02-03 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2022-01-20 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2022-01-20 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-12-07 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-12-07 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on December 7, 2021. |