ME LD1791 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Make the ConnectMaine Authority Responsible for Attachments to and Joint Use of Utility Poles and to Establish Procedures for Broadband Service Infrastructure Crossing Railroad Tracks
Title
An Act to Make the ConnectMaine Authority Responsible for Attachments to and Joint Use of Utility Poles and to Establish Procedures for Broadband Service Infrastructure Crossing Railroad Tracks
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-07 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2023-06-06 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2023-05-17 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2023-05-17 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-04-25 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-04-25 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1791&snum=131 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0716&item=1&snum=131 |